IL HB4122 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-11-15 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-11-15 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that it is unlawful for any governing body, State agency, county government, local municipality, or institute of higher learning that employs peace officers to prohibit a peace officer from carrying a firearm in the performance of his or her duties, unless the peace officer fails to qualify with the firearm, is declared unfit for duty, and is unable to be armed.
Title
CRIM CD-PEACE OFFICER FORCE
Sponsors
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] | Rep. Jim Sacia [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 92 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-15 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2010-04-22 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-07 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2009 | |
2009-05-07 | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-001 | |
2009-05-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-05 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes | |
2009-04-30 | To Criminal Law Subcommittee on Firearms | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2009-03-18 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-18 | First Reading | |
2009-03-18 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner | |
2009-03-18 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-18 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-18 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia | |
2009-03-18 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 092-021-003 | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-11 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 005-002-000 | |
2009-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Higher Education Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Higher Education Committee | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Higher Education Committee | |
2009-02-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-27 | First Reading | |
2009-02-27 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |