IL HB4122 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-22 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-22 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Makes a change to a purpose for which the Water Pollution Control Loan Program shall be used. Effective immediately.
Title
EPA-WATER REVOLVING FUND
Sponsors
Rep. Elaine Nekritz [D] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] |
Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Sen. Dan Kotowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2015 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment; 016-000-000 |
2015-03-16 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2015-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 19.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |