IL HB4146 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-19 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-19 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the TEXAS Act-The Expanding Abortion Services Act. Provides that any person, other than an officer or employee of the State or a unit of local government, may bring a civil action against any person who: commits an act of sexual assault or domestic abuse or causes an unintended pregnancy, regardless of circumstances; knowingly engages in conduct that aids or abets a sexual assault or domestic abuse or causes an unintended pregnancy, regardless of circumstances; or intends to engage in that act or conduct. Provides that if the plaintiff prevails in an action brought under the Act, the court shall award: (1) injunctive relief sufficient to prevent the defendant from committing or engaging in acts that aid or abet sexual assault or domestic abuse or causing an unintended pregnancy; (2) statutory damages in an amount of not less than $10,000 for each act of sexual assault or domestic abuse or action that causes an unintended pregnancy the defendant committed or aided or abetted, of which not less than $5,000 shall be awarded to the plaintiff and $5,000 shall be placed in a special fund in the State treasury, known as the State Abortion Freedom Expansion Fund, to be used by the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, to pay the costs of abortions for pregnant persons who travel to Illinois from states that prohibit abortions for the purpose of obtaining access to abortions in Illinois; and (3) costs and attorney's fees. Establishes defenses and specifies venue. Defines "abortion", "domestic abuse", "pregnancy", and "sexual assault". Amends the State Finance Act to make conforming changes. Contains a severability provision.
Title
EXPANDING ABORTION SERVICES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-09-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-09-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2021-09-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-09-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2021-09-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-09-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2021-09-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2021-09-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2021-09-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-09-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2021-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-09-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.935 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-127 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4146&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4146.htm |