IL HB4245 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0323
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0323
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Renewable Fuels Commission Act to investigate and recommend strategies that the Governor and the General Assembly may implement to promote the use of alternative fuels and encourage the use of vehicles that utilize alternative fuels. Provides that the Commission shall also identify mechanisms that promote research into alternative fuels as well as effective communication and coordination of efforts between this State and local governments, private industry, and institutes of higher education concerning the investigation, research into, and promotion of alternative fuels. Specifies the Commission's membership. Requires the Commission to issue written reports on its investigations and recommendations to the General Assembly and the Governor. Provides for the repeal of this Act on January 1, 2015. Effective immediately.
Title
RENEWABLE FUELS COMMISSION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-11 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0323 | |
2009-08-11 | Effective Date August 11, 2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-15 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-15 | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 | |
2009-05-14 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Brady | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Do Pass Agriculture and Conservation; 009-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kyle McCarter | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-15 | First Reading | |
2009-04-15 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-04-15 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-04-15 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-03 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 117-000-000 | |
2009-04-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto | |
2009-04-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard P. Myers | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-04-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-04-01 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-30 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 | |
2009-03-27 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-27 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. David Reis | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Renewable Energy Committee; 009-000-000 | |
2009-03-12 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Renewable Energy Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-12 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Renewable Energy Committee | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to Renewable Energy Committee | |
2009-02-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-27 | First Reading | |
2009-02-27 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Reis |