IL HB4245 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 6 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-06 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 6 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-06 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Plumbing License Law. Provides that the inspecting licensed plumber (rather than just a licensed plumber) shall make the physical connection between a lawn sprinkler system and the backflow prevention device. Provides that the inspecting licensed plumber shall inspect every aspect of the sprinkler system to ensure the provisions concerning irrigation contractors and lawn sprinkler systems have been met. In provisions concerning civil penalties, provides that a registered irrigation contractor, firm, corporation, partnership, or association that directs, authorizes, or allows a person to practice, offer to practice, attempt to practice, or hold himself or herself out to practice as an irrigation employee without being registered under the Act, shall be subject to a civil penalty of $10,000 for a first and second offense (rather than $5,000) along with other specified penalties. Provides penalties for an inspecting licensed plumber who does not inspect every sprinkler system installed by an irrigation contractor to ensure the provisions of the Act have been met and that the system works mechanically or signs off on the installation without making the physical connection between a lawn sprinkler system and the backflow prevention device.
Title
IRRIGATION CONTRACTORS-SUNSET
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-06 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 79 N: 30 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-06 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-01-06 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 079-030-000 |
2023-01-06 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 020-000-000 |
2023-01-05 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2023-01-05 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-05 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2023-01-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2023-01-05 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-005-001 |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Holmes |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000 |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 4, 2023 |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass Labor; 011-004-000 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 104-000-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-02 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000 |
2022-02-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000 |
2022-02-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2022-01-19 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-05 | House | First Reading |
2021-12-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 80 | 4.34 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 80 | 4.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |