IL HB4288 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-8)
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0826
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-8)
Status: Passed on August 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0826
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Veterans Preference Act. Provides that persons who have been members of the National Guard of any state (rather than the Illinois National Guard) shall be given preference under the Act.
Title
VETERANS PREFERENCE ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0826 |
2018-08-13 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Veterans Affairs; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Veterans Affairs |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-20 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-01-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-19 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
330 | 55 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |