IL HB4311 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Public Transportation Act. Provides that commencing with State fiscal year 2021 programs, and for each fiscal year thereafter, all appropriations made under the provisions of the Act are direct appropriations and shall not constitute a grant program. Provides that the Department of Transportation shall approve programs of proposed expenditures and services submitted by participants under specified provisions. Provides for the adoption of rules to govern participants. Provides requirements for participant applications for funding concerning a program of proposed expenditures and services. Provides additional requirements for specified units of local government when applying for the approval of the program of proposed expenditures and services. Provides that any program of proposed expenditures and services submitted by a participant that is not expressly approved or disapproved by the Department within 45 days after receipt shall be deemed approved, and the Department shall obligate the appropriation for the funding thereof with and to the Comptroller no later than the commencement of the applicable State fiscal year. Provides free of charge fixed route public transportation to senior citizens aged 65 and older who meet specified income eligibility limitations. Requires the Department on Aging to furnish all information reasonably necessary to determine eligibility for free of charge fixed route public transportation to senior citizens. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
DOWNSTATE PUB TRANSPORTATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2020-01-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 740 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 740 | 2-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 740 | 2-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 740 | 2-13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 740 | 2-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 740 | 2-15.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 740 | 2-15.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 740 | 2-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 740 | 2-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 740 | 2-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 740 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 740 | 2-5.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 740 | 2-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 740 | 2-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4311&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4311.htm |