IL HB4334 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that if a minor is taken into custody for an offense which would be a forcible felony if committed by an adult, the minor may be detained in a secure detention facility until the court makes a finding concerning the minor's detention or release at the detention or shelter care hearing.
Title
JUV CT-DETENTN-FORCIBLE FELONY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John M. Cabello |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
705 | 405 | 5-405 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-407 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-410 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-415 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4334&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4334.htm |