IL HB4385 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person also commits aggravated battery when, in committing a battery, other than by the discharge of a firearm, he or she: (1) knowingly causes great bodily harm or permanent disability or disfigurement to an individual whom the person knows to be a Department of Children and Family Services employee; and (2) is, at the time of the commission of the offense, 21 years of age or older and causes great bodily harm or permanent disability or disfigurement to an individual whom the person knows to be a Department of Children and Family Services employee: (i) performing his or her official duties; (ii) battered to prevent performance of his or her official duties; or (iii) battered in retaliation for performing his or her official duties. Provides that "Department of Children and Family Services employee" includes any Department employee or a worker, case worker, or investigator employed by an agency or organization providing social work, case work, or investigative services under a contract with or a grant from the Department of Children and Family Services. Provides that a violation is a Class 2 felony. Provides that if the battery causes great bodily harm or permanent disability or disfigurement to the employee, the penalty is a Class 1 felony. Effective immediately.
Title
AGG BATTERY-DCFS EMPLOYEE
Sponsors
Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Natalie Manley [D] | Sen. Michael Halpin [D] |
Rep. Sue Scherer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022 |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-01-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2022-01-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-01-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2022-01-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-3.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |