IL HB4452 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires substance abuse testing as a condition for filing nomination papers for the office of State Representative or State Senator. Requires the Department of Human Services and the Department of Healthcare and Family Services to implement random substance abuse testing programs for applicants for assistance under the Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) program and for medical assistance, respectively. Under the Illinois Public Aid Code, provides that an individual who tests positive must agree to and complete a substance abuse treatment plan within 60 days after being notified of the positive retest by the Department of Human Services or the Department of Healthcare and Family Services. Provides that if an individual fails to complete a substance abuse treatment plan or tests positive for substance abuse following completion of a substance abuse treatment plan, the individual is barred from eligibility for assistance for a period of one year following the date of the individual's application for assistance. Provides that an individual's ineligibility for assistance does not affect the eligibility of any other member of the individual's family who is included in the application for assistance. Provides that nursing home residents are exempt from the substance abuse testing requirement. Effective January 1, 2010.
Title
DRUG ABUSE-ELECTION-PUBLIC AID
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Remains in Human Services Committee | |
2010-03-10 | Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Human Services Committee; 003-003-000 | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Human Services Committee | |
2009-05-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-11 | First Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bill Mitchell |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4452&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB4452.htm |