IL HB4572 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Adult Protective Services Act. Provides that any person may report information about the suspicious death of an eligible adult to an agency designated to receive such reports or to the Department on Aging. Provides that if a mandated reporter has reason to believe that the death of an eligible adult is the result of abuse or neglect, the matter shall be reported to the agency designated to receive such reports or to the Department for subsequent referral to the appropriate law enforcement agency and coroner or medical examiner. Prohibits employers from discriminating against any employee who makes a good faith oral or written report concerning information about the suspicious death of an eligible adult. Contains provisions concerning the required testimony of a mandated reporter at an administrative hearing concerning the suspicious death of an eligible adult; the referral of evidence to the appropriate law enforcement agency; access to records concerning reports of suspicious deaths due to abuse, neglect, financial exploitation, or self-neglect; and other matters. Makes changes to the definitions of "abuse", "abuser", "mandated reporter", and "provider agency". Defines "insurance adjuster" and "insurance advisor". Effective January 1, 2023.
Title
AGING-SUSPICIOUS DEATHS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 104-000-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-02-18 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-18 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
320 | 20 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
320 | 20 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
320 | 20 | 4.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
320 | 20 | 4.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
320 | 20 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
320 | 20 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |