IL HB4589 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that a department or agency of the State shall not implement any part of the federal health care reform authorized by the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act passed by the United States Congress on March 23, 2010 until all state challenges to the constitutionality of the key provisions of the Act are fully adjudicated. Sets forth a definition for "federal health care reform". Effective immediately.
Title
CIV ADMIN-FEDERAL HEALTHCARE
Sponsors
Rep. JoAnn Osmond [R] | Rep. Mike Bost [R] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Dwight Kay [R] |
Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Ed Sullivan [R] | Rep. Richard Morthland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-06-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2012-03-09 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2012-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2012-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2012-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Evans |
2012-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2012-02-15 | House | Assigned to Health Care Availability and Accessibility Committee |
2012-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4589&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB4589.htm |