IL HB4608 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-17 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-17 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Provides that if an agency decides to hold a public hearing, it shall post on its Internet website certain requisite information to provide the public with notice of the proposed rulemaking. Provides that if an agency decides not to initiate a public hearing, it shall post the requirements to request a public hearing, along with information on the proposed rulemaking, on its Internet website.
Title
RULES PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2016-04-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2016-04-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 22, 2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2016-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 100 | 5-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4608&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB4608.htm |