IL HB4672 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0951
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0951
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that in addition to other topics at in-service training programs, school guidance counselors, teachers, principals, and other school personnel who work with pupils in grades 7 through 12 shall be trained for at least 2 hours in suicide prevention and to identify the warning signs of suicidal behavior in adolescents and teens and shall be taught appropriate intervention and referral techniques. Provides that the education may be accomplished through self-review of suitable suicide prevention materials. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-SUICIDE PREVENTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-28 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0951 | |
2010-06-28 | Effective Date June 28, 2010 | |
2010-06-28 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-27 | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 | |
2010-04-27 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2010-04-27 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-21 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval | |
2010-04-21 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III | |
2010-04-16 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to Education | |
2010-03-23 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading | |
2010-03-18 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 18, 2010 | |
2010-03-17 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley | |
2010-03-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady | |
2010-03-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto | |
2010-03-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edward J. Acevedo | |
2010-03-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2010-03-17 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 | |
2010-03-16 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-12 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin | |
2010-03-12 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-11 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 014-002-002 | |
2010-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2010-03-09 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2010-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Osterman | |
2010-03-03 | Remains in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 003-002-000 | |
2010-01-27 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-10-29 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-10-29 | First Reading | |
2009-10-29 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |