IL HB4685 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children's Health Insurance Program Act, the Covering ALL KIDS Health Insurance Act, and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that in the event the Department of Healthcare and Family Services receives written correspondence from the federal government that the Department interprets as being a denial of authority to implement eligibility verification provisions enacted by Public Act 96-1501, the Department shall file, as soon as practical, a waiver request formally requesting to implement the provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
DHFS-WAIVER-ELIGI VERIFICATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2012-02-17 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2012-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2012-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2012-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 106 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 170 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 11-5.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4685&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB4685.htm |