IL HB4699 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Requires the System to implement a Tier 3 plan by July 1, 2025 that aggregates State and employee contributions in individual participant accounts that are used for payouts after retirement. Provides that a person who becomes a participant of a System on or after July 1, 2025 shall participate in the Tier 3 plan instead of the defined benefit plan. Authorizes a Tier 1 or Tier 2 participant to elect to participate in the Tier 3 plan instead of the defined benefit plan and to also elect to terminate all participation in the defined benefit plan and to have a specified amount credited to his or her account. Makes related changes in the Retirement Systems Reciprocal Act (Article 20 of the Illinois Pension Code) and the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-GARS-TIER 3 PLAN
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Ozinga [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Ozinga |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 2-105.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 2-162 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 2-165.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 20-121 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 20-123 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 20-124 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 20-125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4699&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4699.htm |