IL HB4797 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0785
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-5)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0785
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Clinical Social Work and Social Work Practice Act. Provides that the Act does not prohibit a person, who is not a resident of the State, from performing social work via telehealth in the State for a non-resident of the State for not more than 5 days in any one month or more than 15 days in any one calendar year, had a previous established therapeutic relationship with the non-resident, and the person is authorized to perform such services under the laws of the state or country in which the person resides. Provides that the Act does not prohibit a person, who is not a resident of the State, from performing social work via telehealth in the State for a non-resident of the State currently attending an university or college in the State, had a previous established therapeutic relationship with the non-resident, and the person is authorized to perform such services under the laws of the state or country in which the person resides.
Title
CLINIC SOCIAL WORK-NONRESIDENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0785 |
2022-05-13 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-03-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 011-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 8, 2022 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 104-000-000 |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2022-03-01 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 20 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |