IL HB4843 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that interest or other income which may be earned from moneys deposited with the Department of Juvenile Justice by a resident of the Department of Juvenile Justice shall accrue to the Residents' Benefit Fund (rather than providing that interest or other income from moneys deposited with the Department of Juvenile Justice by a resident of the Department in excess of $200 shall accrue to the individual's account, or in balances up to $200 shall accrue to the Residents' Benefit Fund).
Title
DEPT JUV JUSTICE-RESIDENT-FUND
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Canty [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Restorative Justice; 008-000-000 |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice |
2024-02-08 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary Beth Canty |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-4-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |