IL HB4890 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Corporation Act. Provides that each individual medical corporation employee licensed pursuant to the Podiatric Medical Practice Act of 1987 shall remain subject to reprimand or discipline for his or her conduct under the provisions of that Act. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAL CORP-PODIATRISTS
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Poe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-08 | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee | |
2010-01-15 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-01-15 | First Reading | |
2010-01-13 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4890&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB4890.htm |