IL HB4922 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-2)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-2)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that it is an unlawful practice to offer to consumers at retail a rebate made on a stored-value card that charges dormancy fees or other post-issuance fees. Defines terms.
Title
CONS FRAUD REBATE STORED VALUE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 17 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 67 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | House | Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken |
2018-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2018-08-03 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 035-017-000 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 008-003-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-044-000 |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-20 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 003-002-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
815 | 505 | 2LLL | Amended Code | Citation Text |