IL HB4971 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that any owner or tenant of real property within 1200 feet in any direction of any dangerous or unsafe building located within the territory of any municipality (rather than within the territory of a municipality with a population of 500,000 or more) may file with the appropriate municipal authority a request that the municipality apply to the circuit court of the county in which the building is located for an order permitting the demolition, removal of garbage, debris, and other noxious or unhealthy substances and materials from, or repair or enclosure of, the building under specified provisions of the Code.
Title
MUNI CD-DANGEROUS/UNSAFE BLDG
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Travis Weaver |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Cities & Villages Committee; 015-000-000 |
2024-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2024-03-04 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2024-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brad Stephens |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-31-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4971&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4971.htm |