IL HB5056 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that certain provisions of the Act apply only when the sale of motor fuel is made for use by the purchaser and not for resale. Effective immediately.
Title
MOTOR FUEL TAX-LICENSE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | To Sales, Amusement, & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 505 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 5a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5056&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5056.htm |