IL HB5184 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF) Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Specifies that in order to be eligible for a surviving spouse annuity, the spouse of the annuitant must meet a specific eligibility requirement no matter whether the annuitant was in service on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act or the effective date of Public Act 87-850. Removes a provision that requires survivor annuities to be offset by workers' compensation benefits. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-IMRF-SURVIVING SPOUSE
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Poe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-26 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2012-03-26 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Personnel and Pensions Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-03-26 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2012-03-26 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) March 30, 2012 |
2012-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.36 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 7-154 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-222 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5184&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB5184.htm |