IL HB5227 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person is not justified in the use of force against another if the person is a streetgang member or gang member and is in possession of a firearm in violation of the Deadly Weapons Article of the Code, the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act, or the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Defines "streetgang member" and "gang member".
Title
CRIM CD-NO JUSTIFIABLE FORCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 7-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5227&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5227.htm |