IL HB5287 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Effective Date July 1, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - Effective Date July 1, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. In provisions regarding county officer stipends in counties of less than 2,000,000 population, provides that, for State fiscal years beginning on or after July 1, 2024, the State Board of Elections shall remit to each county the amount required for the stipend for the county clerk, the county recorder, and the chief clerk of each county board of election commissioners. Requires the money from the State Board of Elections to be deposited by the county treasurer into a fund dedicated for that purpose, and requires the county payroll clerk to pay the stipend within 10 business days after those funds are deposited into the county fund. Provides that the stipend shall not be considered part of the recipient's base compensation and must be remitted to the recipient in addition to the recipient's annual salary or compensation. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2024, the county shall be responsible for the State and federal income tax reporting and withholding as well as the employer contributions under the Illinois Pension Code on the stipend under the provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
COUNTY CD-OFFICER STIPENDS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-01 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2024 |
2024-07-01 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0607 |
2024-07-01 | House | Governor Approved |
2024-06-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2024 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2024 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 007-000-000 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2024-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 4-6001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |