IL HB5302 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Labor Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Creates the Occupational Health and Safety Act Violation Reporting Procedures Awareness Task Force within the Department of Labor. Adds provisions governing Task Force membership, duties, and compensation. Provides that the Task Force shall meet quarterly at a time it deems appropriate. Provides that the Task Force shall submit a report to the Department and the General Assembly after every 2 meetings. Provides that the reports shall advise the Department on ways to give unaware or inexperienced workers greater accessibility in acquiring assistance in identifying and correcting violations at their workplace and make recommendations on complementary proposals or policies. Provides that the provisions concerning the Task Force are repealed 2 years after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Effective immediately.
Title
OSHA AWARENESS TASK FORCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5302&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5302.htm |