IL HB5325 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Lupus Foundation of America Fund. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State may issue Lupus Foundation of America plates. Provides that the cost of initial issuance of these plates shall be $20 in addition to any other fees, $5 of which will go to the Lupus Foundation of America Fund and $15 of which will go to the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that renewal of these plates will cost $20, $18 of which will go to the Lupus Foundation of America Fund and $2 of which will go to the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Allows for distribution, subject to appropriation, of money from the Lupus Foundation of America Fund to the Lupus Foundation of America, Illinois Chapter.
Title
VEH CD- LUPUS PLATES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 3, 2014 |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2014-04-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-006-000 |
2014-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2014-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-06 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2014-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.855 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-699.14 | New Code | See Bill Text |