IL HB5385 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1074
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-8)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1074
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Veterans' Affairs Act. Provides that, subject to appropriation, the Department of Veterans' Affairs shall serve as the State's principal assistance organization under the United States Department of Defense's SkillBridge program for employers and transitioning service members. Provides that as the State's principal assistance organization under the United States Department of Defense's SkillBridge program for qualified businesses in this State and for transitioning service members who reside in, or who wish to reside in, this State, the Department shall: (1) establish and maintain, as applicable, its certification for the SkillBridge program or any other similar workforce training and transition programs established by the United States Department of Defense; (2) educate businesses, business associations, and transitioning service members regarding the SkillBridge program and its benefits, and educate military command and personnel within the State on the opportunities available to transitioning service members through the SkillBridge program; (3) assist businesses in obtaining approval for skilled workforce training curricula under the SkillBridge program, including, but not limited to, apprenticeships, internships, or fellowships; and (4) match transitioning service members who are deemed eligible for SkillBridge participation by their military command with training opportunities offered by participating businesses, with the intent of having transitioning service members achieve gainful employment in this State upon completion of their SkillBridge training. Permits the Department to adopt rules.
Title
DEPT VETERANS AFF-SKILLBRIDGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1074 |
2022-06-10 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-06-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Eric Mattson |
2022-04-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2022-03-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Friess |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000 |
2022-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2022-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 009-000-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2022-02-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-17 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Veterans' Affairs Committee; 009-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella |