IL HB5399 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections relating to executive clemency. Provides that the Governor shall decide each application and communicate his or her decision to the Prisoner Review Board within one year after the hearing by the Board on the petition seeking a pardon, commutation, or reprieve. Effective immediately.
Title
CD CORR-EXECUTIVE CLEMENCY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-26 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-24 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-11 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2010-03-11 | Remains in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2010-03-11 | Recommends Do Pass as Amended Subcommittee/ Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 003-000-000 | |
2010-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote; Subcommittee | |
2010-03-11 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading | |
2010-02-04 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Constance A. Howard |