IL HB5432 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code and Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a county or municipality may not adopt, enforce, or implement an ordinance, resolution, policy, program, or other regulation affecting a tenancy that (1) imposes or threatens to impose a penalty against a resident, property owner, tenant, landlord, or other person solely as a consequence of contact with a law enforcement agency, (2) requires a property owner or landlord to do, or imposes a penalty on a property owner or landlord for the failure to do, specified things, (3) defines as a nuisance, any contact by a tenant with a law enforcement agency, any request by a tenant, landlord, resident or property owner for emergency assistance, (4) requires a tenant to obtain a certificate of occupancy as a condition of tenancy, or (5) establishes, maintains, or promotes a registry of tenants for the purposes of discouraging a landlord from renting to a tenant on the registry or excluding a tenant on the registry from rental housing within the county or municipality. Defines "penalty". Limits the concurrent exercise of home rule powers. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIME-FREE HOUSING ORDINANCES
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] | Rep. Robert Rita [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Rep. Lilian Jimenez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Housing; 010-005-001 |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Housing |
2024-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel "Chris" Welch |
2024-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Housing; 011-003-000 |
2024-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Housing |
2024-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert "Bob" Rita |
2024-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-12022 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-13-28 | New Code | See Bill Text |