IL HB5448 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that, beginning January 1, 2024, the annual earnings, salary, or wages (based on the plan year) of a Tier 2 member or participant under the General Assembly, State Employees, State Universities, Downstate Teachers, Chicago Teachers, or Judges Article shall not exceed 90.5% of the federal Social Security Wage Base then in effect or the amount otherwise calculated under the Tier 2 provisions, whichever is greater. Makes changes to the funding formula beginning in fiscal year 2025 for the 5 State-funded retirement systems. Restricts participation in the General Assembly Retirement System and Judges Retirement System to persons who first become participants before January 8, 2025. Provides for participation under the State Employees Article by members of the General Assembly and judges. Provides that any benefit increase that results from the amendatory Act is excluded from the definition of "new benefit increase". Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement by the State. Effective immediately.
Title
PENSIONS-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-12 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5448&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB5448.htm |