IL HB5482 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Professional Regulation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall allow an applicant to provide his or her individual taxpayer identification number as an alternative to provide a social security number when applying for a license. Provides that no applicant shall be denied a license solely based on his or her immigration status or citizenship status. Amends the School Code. Provides that no person shall be denied an educator license solely based on his or her citizenship status or immigration status. Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. Removes the requirement that an applicant seeking licensure as a registered pharmacist must provide evidence of that he or she is a United States citizen or a legally admitted alien. Amends the Attorney Act. Provides that no person shall be denied a license to practice law solely based on his or her citizenship status or immigration status (rather than because he or she is not a citizen of the United States). Makes conforming changes.
Title
DFPR LICENSURE-IMMIGRATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-003-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2018-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2105 | 2105-140 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2105 | 2105-15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 85 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 205 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |