IL HB5495 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Changes references in the statute on unlawful sale of firearms from "sell" or "give" to "transfer". Prohibits multiple sales of handguns within a 30-day period. Creates the offense of unlawful acquisition of handguns. Provides exemptions and affirmative defenses. Penalty is a Class A misdemeanor for a first offense and a Class 4 felony for a second or subsequent offense.
Title
CRIM CD-ONE GUN PER MONTH
Sponsors
Rep. Luis Arroyo [D] | Rep. William Burns [D] | Rep. Barbara Currie [D] | Rep. William Davis [D] |
Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Charles Jefferson [D] | Rep. Harry Osterman [D] | Rep. Eddie Washington [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-05-07 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 28, 2010 | |
2010-05-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson | |
2010-04-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez | |
2010-04-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Washington | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-04-28 | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-002-000 | |
2010-04-28 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 7, 2010 | |
2010-03-26 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Osterman | |
2010-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis | |
2010-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo | |
2010-03-03 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-03 | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 | |
2010-02-22 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading | |
2010-02-04 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William D. Burns |