IL HB5496 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0982
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0982
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts by replacing the term "accident", in relation to automobiles, motor vehicles, and traffic accidents, with the term "crash". Provides that a State agency may exhaust any forms or documents using "accident" prior to printing copies of a new version using "crash". Effective immediately.
Title
WORD CHANGE: ACCIDENT TO CRASH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0982 |
2022-05-27 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2023 |
2022-05-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-07 | House | House Concurs |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 111-000-000 |
2022-04-06 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 013-000-000 |
2022-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Tom Weber |
2022-03-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2022-03-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Transportation; 017-000-000 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 4, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Craig Wilcox |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-03-01 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-001-000 |
2022-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-02-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2022-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Weber |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-16 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 012-000-000 |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra Hamilton |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Weber |