IL HB5510 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Passed on July 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1241
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-3)
Status: Passed on July 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1241
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Domestic Violence Act of 1986. Provides that if an emergency order of protection is issued when the court is not in session, the judge who issued the order shall promptly communicate or convey the order to the sheriff to facilitate the entry of the order by the Department of State Police into the Law Enforcement Agencies Data System.
Title
DOM VIOL ORDER DELIVERY-SHERIF
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-23 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1241 | |
2010-07-23 | Effective Date January 1, 2011 | |
2010-07-23 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-27 | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2010 | |
2010-04-23 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 23, 2010 | |
2010-04-22 | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000 | |
2010-04-14 | Postponed - Criminal Law | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2010-03-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-15 | First Reading | |
2010-03-12 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2010-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 15, 2010 | |
2010-03-12 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-12 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2010-03-12 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger | |
2010-03-12 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2010-03-12 | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 105-000-000 | |
2010-03-12 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate | |
2010-03-11 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-11 | Second Reading - Standard Debate | |
2010-03-10 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 | |
2010-03-09 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate | |
2010-03-09 | Recalled to Second Reading - Standard Debate | |
2010-03-09 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-09 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate | |
2010-03-02 | Second Reading - Standard Debate | |
2010-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Osterman | |
2010-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson | |
2010-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Washington | |
2010-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke | |
2010-02-25 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2010-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2010-02-25 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate | |
2010-02-25 | Do Pass / Standard Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 004-003-000 | |
2010-02-23 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey | |
2010-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2010-02-18 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca | |
2010-02-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2010-02-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack McGuire | |
2010-02-11 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2010-02-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2010-02-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski | |
2010-02-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André M. Thapedi | |
2010-02-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin | |
2010-02-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto | |
2010-02-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis | |
2010-02-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur L. Turner | |
2010-02-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell | |
2010-02-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2010-02-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente | |
2010-02-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser | |
2010-02-10 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading | |
2010-02-05 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith Farnham |