IL HB5510 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Currency Exchange Act. Defines "government assistance check", "government check", "payroll check", and "printed". Provides additional considerations by the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation for determining the maximum rate schedules that can be charged for check cashing and writing of money orders by community currency exchanges and ambulatory currency exchanges. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation's authority to establish rate schedules for check cashing is subject to specified rate caps. Makes other changes. Effective June 1, 2019.
Title
CURRENCY EXCHANGE-CHECKS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Consumer Protection Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
205 | 405 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
205 | 405 | 19.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5510&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5510.htm |