IL HB5525 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1325
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1325
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that it is a Class 1 felony for an employee of a penal institution, without authority of any person designated or authorized to grant such authority, to bring into or to attempt to bring into the penal institution, or to possess in the penal institution a tool to defeat security mechanisms or a cutting tool. Provides that it is a Class X felony with a minimum term of imprisonment of 10 years for a person who is an employee of a penal institution to knowingly and without authority of any person designated or authorized to grant such authority to deliver or possess with intent to deliver electronic contraband in the penal institution. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-PENAL-CONTRABAND
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-27 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1325 | |
2010-07-27 | Effective Date July 27, 2010 | |
2010-07-27 | Governor Approved | |
2010-06-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-04 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-05-04 | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2010 | |
2010-04-23 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-000 | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2010-03-24 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-24 | First Reading | |
2010-03-24 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2010-03-24 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-001-000 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-11 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-11 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 006-000-000 | |
2010-03-09 | Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed | |
2010-03-09 | Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading | |
2010-02-08 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |