IL HB5531 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-7)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act and the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that the penalties for the knowing manufacture or delivery, possession with intent to manufacture or deliver, or possession of desomorphine are the same as the penalties for the knowing manufacture or delivery, possession with intent to manufacture or deliver, or possession of heroin (rather than a non-enhanced Class X felony for manufacture or delivery or possession with intent to manufacture or deliver 200 grams or more, a Class 1 felony for manufacture or delivery or possession with intent to manufacture or deliver not less than 50 grams but under 200 grams, and a Class 2 felony for the manufacture or delivery or possession with intent to manufacture or deliver less than 50 grams; a non-enhanced Class 1 felony for possession of 200 grams or more and a Class 4 felony for possession of less than 200 grams). Provides that the immunity from criminal prosecution of a person who, in good faith, seeks or obtains emergency medical assistance for someone experiencing an overdose or a person who is experiencing an overdose applies to the possession of less than 3 grams of a substance containing desomorphine. Amends the Drug Dealer Liability Act. Includes "desomorphine" in the definition of "specified illegal drug". Effective immediately.
Title
CONTROLLED SUB-DESOMORPHINE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Meier |
2014-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2014-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2014-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2014-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2014-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2014-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2014-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2014-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Conroy |
2014-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2014-02-20 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2014-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2014-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2014-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2014-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2014-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2014-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2014-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2014-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2014-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2014-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 570 | 414 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 57 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5531&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB5531.htm |