IL HB5548 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-05 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that a revenue tax collected by a municipality may also be used towards costs associated with the abatement of unsafe or dilapidated structures (currently, only on municipal operation, public infrastructure, or property tax relief). Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD-DILAPIDATED STRUCTURES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-05 | House | Tabled |
2016-04-05 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2016-04-01 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. John Cavaletto |
2016-03-29 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John Cavaletto |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-1.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5548&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB5548.htm |