IL HB5644 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Local Government Bankruptcy Neutral Evaluation Act. Makes legislative findings. Defines terms. Authorizes a local public entity to initiate a neutral evaluation process if that entity is unable to meet its financial obligations. Provides for the selection and qualification of an evaluator, the evaluation process, cessation of an evaluation, declaration of a fiscal emergency, and definition of liabilities. Provides that records prepared for or used in connection with the Local Government Bankruptcy Neutral Evaluation Act are exempt from disclosure. Amends the Open Meetings Act. Provides that a public body may hold closed meetings related to the Local Government Bankruptcy Neutral Evaluation Act. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL GOV BANKRUPTCY NEUT EVAL
Sponsors
Rep. Jeanne Ives [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2018-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 120 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |