IL SB0059 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Local Records Act. Provides that if an officer or agency submits a Local Records Disposal Certificate to the Local Records Commission and no objection to the Certificate has been received by the Local Records Commission within 30 days after the Local Record Disposal Certificate has been received by the Local Records Commission, then the officer or agency may dispose of the records listed on the Local Records Disposal Certificate without Local Records Commission review or approval.
Title
LOCAL RECORDS-DISPOSAL
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Prefiled with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
50 | 205 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=59&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0059.htm |