IL SB0059 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Dual Credit Quality Act. Provides that an institution may not collect fees from a high school student enrolled in a dual credit course in excess of what the institution needs, per student, to administer a dual credit program. Provides that any fees collected from the high school student may not be used for any purpose other than administering the dual credit program. Effective immediately.
Title
DUAL CREDIT COURSE-FEES
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Christopher Belt [D] | Sen. Rachelle Crowe [D] | Sen. Ann Gillespie [D] |
Sen. Laura Ellman [D] | Sen. Suzanne Glowiak Hilton [D] | Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Toi Hutchinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-12-07 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2019 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 014-000-000 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-01-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 27 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=59&GAID=15&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/SB/10100SB0059.htm |