IL SB0061 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0565
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-12-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0565
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that for specified types of charges pending before the Department of Human Rights, if the charging party has initiated litigation for the purpose of seeking final relief in a State or federal court or before an administrative law judge or hearing officer in an administrative proceeding before a local government administrative agency, and if a final decision on the merits in that litigation or administrative hearing would preclude the charging party from bringing another action based on the pending charge, the Department shall cease its investigation and dismiss the pending charge by order of the Director, who shall provide the charging party notice of his or her right to commence a civil action in the appropriate circuit court or other appropriate court of competent jurisdiction. Provides that the Director shall also provide the charging party notice of his or her right to seek review of the dismissal order before the Human Rights Commission. Provides that any review by the Commission of the dismissal shall be limited to the question of whether the charge was properly dismissed under the new provisions. Provides that the Department may continue to investigate an allegation in a charge that is unique to the Act or otherwise could not have been included in the litigation or administrative proceeding. Provides that for charges relating to real estate transactions, the Department may administratively close a charge pending before the Department if the issues that are the basis of the charge are being litigated in a State or federal court proceeding. Deletes language providing that the Department shall stay any administrative proceedings after the filing of a civil action by or on behalf of the aggrieved party under any federal or State law seeking relief with respect to the alleged civil rights violation. Makes other changes.
Title
HUMAN RIGHTS-CHARGE PROCEDURES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-11-09 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-12-15 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0565 |
2017-12-15 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-12-15 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-12-08 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2017-11-09 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 052-000-000 |
2017-11-09 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-11-09 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2017-11-09 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-11-09 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 9, 2017 |
2017-11-09 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-11-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2017-11-08 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-11-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-11-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-11-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-000-000 |
2017-11-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-11-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-11-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-11-02 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 10, 2017 |
2017-11-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-11-02 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-002-000 |
2017-05-17 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2017-05-17 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 002-001-000 |
2017-05-10 | House | To Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 15, 2017 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 28, 2017 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Postponed - Judiciary |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Prefiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
775 | 5 | 7-109.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 7A-102 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
775 | 5 | 8-103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |