IL SB0062 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-24 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Epinephrine Auto-Injector Act. Provides that a health care practitioner may prescribe epinephrine auto-injectors in the name of an authorized entity where allergens capable of causing anaphylaxis may be present. Requires each employee, agent, or other individual of the authorized entity to complete a training program before using an epinephrine auto-injector. Provides that a trained employee, agent, or other individual of the authorized entity may either provide or administer an epinephrine auto-injector to a person who the employee, agent, or other individual believes in good faith is experiencing anaphylaxis. Allows an entity or organization to keep on its premises an Emergency Public Access Station containing epinephrine auto-injectors under the general oversight of a health care practitioner that is capable of communicating with a health care practitioner in real time before it may be unlocked to dispense epinephrine auto-injectors. Defines required terms. Amends the Good Samaritan Act. Exempts from civil liability any person authorized under the Epinephrine Auto-Injector Act who administers an epinephrine auto-injector to a person he or she believes in good faith to be experiencing anaphylaxis.
Title
EPI AUTO-INJECTOR FOR ENTITIES
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Nybo [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 24, 2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chris Nybo |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=62&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB0062.htm |