IL SB0071 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Public Act 99-906 to add an immediate effective date to certain Sections. Effective immediately.
Title
PUB UTILITIES-NEW PROJECTS
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. William McCann [R] | Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
Sen. Susan Rezin [R] | Sen. Pat McGuire [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Sen. Linda Holmes [D] |
Rep. Louis Lang [D] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0016 |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Effective Date June 30, 2017 |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-22 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2017-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-18 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy Committee; 012-000-000 |
2017-05-09 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Energy Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-25 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 047-003-000 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Energy and Public Utilities; 009-000-000 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Energy and Public Utilities |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Energy and Public Utilities |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |