IL SB0086 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0354
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0354
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abuse of Adults with Disabilities Intervention Act. Provides that the Office of Inspector General shall file with the Governor and the General Assembly, no later than January 1 following the end of each fiscal year (rather than within 90 days after the end of each fiscal year), a report concerning its implementation of the Domestic Abuse Project. Defines the terms "mental abuse" and "financial exploitation". Removes the definition of the term "exploitation". Redefines "abuse" to mean the causing of any physical, sexual, or mental abuse (rather than mental injury) to an adult with disabilities. Expands the definition of "physical abuse" to include directing another person to physically abuse a person with disabilities. Expands the definition of "sexual abuse" to include acts of sexual exploitation including, but not limited to, facilitating or compelling an adult with disabilities to become a prostitute, or receiving anything of value from an adult with disabilities knowing it was obtained in whole or in part from the practice of prostitution. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-DOMESTIC ABUSE PROJECT-RPT
Sponsors
Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Rep. Louis Lang [D] |
Rep. Marlow Colvin [D] | Rep. Naomi Jakobsson [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-12 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0354 |
2011-08-12 | Senate | Effective Date August 12, 2011 |
2011-08-12 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2011-06-14 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2011-05-16 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 098-000-000 |
2011-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-04 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-05-04 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-05-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000 |
2011-04-11 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin |
2011-04-11 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2011-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-03 | House | First Reading |
2011-03-03 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2011-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-03-03 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 16, 2011 |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading February 15, 2011 |
2011-02-15 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-01-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-01-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2435 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2435 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |