IL SB0128 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides that, during the 6 months after terminating service as an executive branch constitutional officer, a former executive branch constitutional officer shall not receive compensation or fees for services from a person or entity required to register under the Lobbyist Registration Act. Applies to executive branch constitutional officers who terminate service as an executive branch constitutional officer on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act.
Title
ETHICS-EXECUTIVE OFFICIALS
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-02-16 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Ethics |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 430 | 5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=128&GAID=17&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/SB/10300SB0128.htm |