IL SB0179 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code and the State Finance Act. Creates the United Auto Workers' Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides for the issuance of United Auto Workers license plates. Provides that in addition to the appropriate registration fees, an applicant for the special plate shall be charged a fee of $25 at original issuance and at renewal. Provides that $10 of the additional original issuance fee and $23 of the renewal fee shall be deposited into the United Auto Workers' Fund. Provides that $15 of the original issuance fee and $2 of the renewal fee shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that, subject to appropriation by the General Assembly and approval by the Secretary of State, the moneys in the United Auto Workers' Fund shall be paid as grants for charitable purposes supported by the Illinois local unions affiliated with the United Auto Workers.
Title
VEH CD-UAW SPECIAL PLATES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-05 | To Transportation Subcommittee on Special Issues | |
2009-02-10 | Assigned to Transportation | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-01-30 | First Reading | |
2009-01-30 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=179&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB0179.htm |