IL SB0608 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that mobile specialty care providers that serve children enrolled in a managed care organization shall not be required to obtain prior authorization in order to receive reimbursement for all services within the normal scope of chronic disease management, including, but not limited to, asthma, diabetes, obesity, and reproductive health. Requires mobile specialty care providers to make all reasonable attempts, as defined by rule of the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, to connect the children they serve to their primary care physician or an appropriate hospital defined as a Safety-Net Hospital under the Code to maintain a proper medical home. Defines "mobile specialty care provider". Requires the Department to adopt any rules necessary to implement these provisions. Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
MOBILE SPECIALTY CARE PROVIDER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Special Committee on Oversight of Medicaid Managed Care |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=608&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB0608.htm |