IL SB0995 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-12 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the School Code's construction.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-12 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jil Tracy |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 10, 2024 |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-06-26 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 19, 2023 |
2023-04-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10(a) Third Reading Deadline Established As May 25, 2023 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 28, 2023 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 19, 2023 |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 10, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000 |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |